FL H0227 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that first responders are entitled to workers' compensation benefits for posttraumatic stress disorder in specified circumstances; provides standard of proof of such disorder & requirements relating to such benefits; provides time for notice of injury or death; requires employing agency to provide mental health training; provides declaration of important state interest.
Title
Workers' Compensation Benefits for First Responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376 |
2018-03-05 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 376 |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | CS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time 686 |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-26 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time 603 |
2018-02-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-30 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-10-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S376 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Chapter No. 2018-124
S126 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H629 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
S126 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H629 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 1815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |