FL H0227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from committing certain acts against reproductive health services clients, providers, or assistants; prohibits person from damaging certain properties; provides penalties & requirements for departures from sentences & fines; provides civil remedies for those aggrieved by specified violations against reproductive health services clients, providers, or assistants or against certain properties; authorizes civil actions for such violations; requires court to take actions necessary to safeguard health, safety, or privacy of certain people & entities.
Title
Access to Clinics
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Cindy Polo [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S412 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
762 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
762 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
762 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
762 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
762 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
762 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/227 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/227/BillText/Filed/PDF |