FL H0227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases sentence points requiring nonstate sanction in certain circumstances; requires findings for sentences above maximum sentence recommended under Criminal Punishment Code; removes provision limiting appeals of sentences to circumstances when sentence is lower than lowest permissible sentence or other specified circumstances; revises calculation of highest & lowest permissible sentences.
Title
Criminal Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S424 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S552 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S552 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/227 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/227/BillText/Filed/PDF |