FL H0227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires district school board to adopt specified policies during certain declared state of emergency; provides requirements for such policies; requires statewide, standardized assessments be waived during certain declared state of emergency.
Title
School Protocols During a COVID-19 State of Emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee; Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/227 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/227/BillText/Filed/PDF |