FL H0229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOT to conduct study on safety of certain walking conditions; requires department to submit report to Governor, Legislature, & State Board of Education; provides requirements for the report.
Title
Hazardous Walking Conditions for K-12 Students
Sponsors
House Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee | Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] | Rep. Christine Hunschofsky [D] |
Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-04-05 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Original reference removed: Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-02 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-02 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | PCS added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee; Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education and Employment Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S178 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
336 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |