FL H0231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida Hospital Patient Protection Act"; requires health care facilities to implement staffing plan that provides minimum direct care registered nurse staffing levels; prohibits health care facility from assigning unlicensed personnel to perform functions or tasks that should be performed by licensed or registered nurses; requires AHCA to post on its website information regarding health care facilities on which civil penalties have been imposed.
Title
Delivery of Nursing Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S644 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/231 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/231/BillText/Filed/PDF |