FL H0239 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions that prohibit use of certain medications or substances on racing animals; revises penalties; revises timeframe in which certain prosecutions must begin; revises procedures; authorizes Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering of DBPR to solicit input from DACS for purposes of adopting certain rules.
Title
Medication and Testing of Racing Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Chapter No. 2015-88 | |
2015-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 226 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Agriculture; Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Agriculture; Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/15 |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/12/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-08 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-08 | House | CS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-08 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-05 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0226 (Same As) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
H0187 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
S0262 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
H1233 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died pending review of CS
H0187 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
S0262 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
H1233 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died pending review of CS