FL H0239 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits performance of advanced well stimulation treatments; provides that permits for drilling or operating wells do not authorize performance of advanced well treatments; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Well Stimulation Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S146 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S314 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H7029 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S7064 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37719Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3772405Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback