FL H0239 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ratifies proposed amendment to U.S. Constitution relating to equal rights for men & women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Rights for Men and Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-09-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S392 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback