FL H0251 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes students participating in intercollegiate athletics to receive specified compensation; provides requirements for specified students, postsecondary educational institutions, certain organizations, & specified representatives; & creates Florida College System Athlete Name, Image, & Likeness Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students Participating In Intercollegiate Athletics

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; Education Committee
2019-09-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H287 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
S582 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S646 (Similar To) 2020-06-12 - Chapter No. 2020-28
H7051 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 646 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004098Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback