FL H0253 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for fee to be collected on deposit of bail in certain drug & alcohol-related offenses; requires FDLE to use funds for grants to law enforcement agencies in certain small counties for drug enforcement activities.
Title
Law Enforcement Activities for Opioids in Small Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-10-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1720 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/253 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/253/BillText/Filed/PDF |