FL H0257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Consultants' Competitive Negotiation Act may not be construed to prevent cooperative purchasing between governmental agencies if certain criteria are met.
Title
Acquisition of Certain Professional Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-09-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1518 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/257 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/257/BillText/Filed/PDF |