FL H0263 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits cost-sharing requirements for specified breast cancer tests & procedures under individual health insurance policies; group, blanket, & franchise health insurance policies; & health maintenance contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage for Breast Cancer Tests and Procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S416 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62742394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413133Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback