FL H0269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits tax collector from including on forms, assessing, or collecting certain charges on property tax bills for certain identified populations; prohibits tax collector to authorize debt collection entity to collect certain charges on property tax bills for certain identified populations; prohibits tax collector from selling tax certificate on certain properties if only outstanding amounts due are for delinquent payment of property tax; requires DOR to work with tax collectors to identify mechanisms, strategies, & funding sources for helping certain populations pay for delinquent charges.
Title
Senior Citizen and Teacher Property Tax Protection
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/269 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/269/BillText/Filed/PDF |