FL H0269 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Now in Commerce Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires insurers to provide loss run statements to insureds within specified timeframe; provides notification requirements; provides claims history requirements for loss run statements; prohibits insurers from being required to provide loss reserve information; prohibits fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loss Run Statements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-11-13HouseCS referred to Commerce Committee
2019-11-13HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-11-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-11-06HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-10-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-10-14HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-10-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S292 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6269202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback