FL H0271 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits attorneys from engaging in misleading advertisement related to prescribed drugs; imposes limitations on auditing entities; requires OIR establish appeals process to findings in audit reports; requires registration of pharmacy services administration organizations; requires health insurers & HMOs to offer online prior authorization process; requires health insurers to publish procedure for exemptions for first fail policies; requires pharmacy benefit managers to publish list of covered drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescribed Drug Services and Audits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H559 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S650 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S906 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4651871Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651885Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764742Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62766998Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413924Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback