FL H0307 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes agency, university, college, school district, or other political subdivision of state to provide preferential consideration to Florida business in awarding competitively bid contracts to purchase construction services; provides that for specified competitive solicitations authority to grant preference supersedes any local ordinance or regulation which grants preference to specified vendors; requires university, college, school district, or other political subdivision to make specified disclosures in competitive solicitation documents; requires legal written opinions to accompany specified bids, proposals, & reply documents; expands provisions that require agency, university, college, school district, or other political subdivision of state to provide preferential consideration to Florida business in awarding competitively bid contracts to purchase personal property to require counties & municipalities to provide such preferential consideration; provides that for specified competitive solicitations authority to grant preference supersedes any local ordinance or regulation which grants preference to specified vendors; requires university, college, county, municipality, school district, or other political subdivision to make specified disclosures in competitive solicitation documents.
Title
Preference in Award of Governmental Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-06 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1017 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S0684 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
S0684 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs