FL H0309 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits licensed health care practitioners from using specified names or titles under certain circumstances; requires Department of Health to issue cease & desist notice to licensed health care practitioner for specified violations; provides for service of notice & penalties.
Title
Prohibited Acts by Health Care Practitioners
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] |
Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-14 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-14 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-10-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S500 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages