FL H0309 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employees of adult family-care homes to receive certain information upon beginning employment; requires employees complete additional training within specified period; provides requirements for such training; requires DOEA or its designee to develop education & training regarding Alzheimer's disease & other dementia-related disorders for certain persons; provides requirements for such training & education; provides requirements for covered providers.
Title
Dementia-related Staff Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Amendment 548773 filed |
2021-04-15 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-14 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-14 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-03 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S634 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 1755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 4785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 6045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 5025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |