FL H0327 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person commits specified violations for illegal taking, possession, & sale of bears; prohibits illegal taking, possession, & sale of bears; provides penalties.
Title
Illegal Taking, Possession, and Sale of Bears
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#741 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#415 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#415 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Chapter No. 2020-66 | |
2020-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (686766) |
2020-03-11 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (686766) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 688 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/05/20 |
2020-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-11-13 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S688 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 327
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 4041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |