FL H0333 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of cellular telephone while operating motor vehicle except when using headset or hands-free device; provides exemptions; provides penalty; provides for enforcement only as secondary offense.
Title
Use of Cellular Telephones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00035; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped | |
2010-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped | |
2009-11-20 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-11-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation