FL H0333 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DJJ to establish community-based juvenile justice pilot programs in specified judicial circuits; provides purpose of programs; requires DJJ to contract with specified entities to serve as regional coordinating agency for each pilot program; provides contract requirements; requires quality assurance program; requires minimum thresholds for services; requires DJJ to ensure pilot program services are delivered in accordance with state & federal laws & regulations; requires annual evaluation of regional coordinating agencies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community-based Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 33
2011-03-03 Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 149
2011-02-25 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-02-22 CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 -HJ 151
2011-02-15 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/22/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-02-07 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 33
2011-01-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0554 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
985665Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback