FL H0333 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DEP to establish grant program to reimburse local law enforcement agencies for expenses associated with collection & disposal of household pharmaceuticals; requires court to impose additional surcharge for specified offenses; provides for proceeds of surcharge to be deposited into Household Pharmaceuticals Collection & Disposal Trust Fund; provides for clerk of court to retain service charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collection and Disposal of Household Pharmaceuticals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 34
2011-10-28 Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 34
2011-10-11 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback