FL H0333 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Florida Retirement System members to be reemployed after retirement under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reemployment After Retirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Government Operations Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-01-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0696 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Withdrawn from further consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121591Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback