FL H0333 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urges U.S. Congress to annually recognize Haitian Independence Day, Haitian Flag Day, & Haitian Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognition of Haitian Independence Day, Haitian Flag Day, & Haitian Heritage Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
2016-02-25HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2016-02-25HouseFavorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
2016-02-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-10-30HouseReferred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-10-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0069 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0568 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0600 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H9057 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback