FL H0333 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the term "special operations forces"; exempting certain applicants from completing a basic recruit training program approved by the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission under specified conditions; requiring an employing agency, training center, or criminal justice selection center to verify and document that certain applicants have served in the special operations forces for a minimum period and completed certain training if they seek an exemption from the commission-approved basic recruit training program, etc.
Title
Minimum Officer Qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#626 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#626 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Chapter No. 2018-46 | |
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 876 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 470 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-14 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (399147) 587 |
2018-02-14 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-26 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-24 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-10-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S470 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 333
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |