FL H0341 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-85
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to establishment of institute & specifies primary responsibilities; conforms provisions relating to agreement by Board of Governors & not-for-profit corporation for use of facilities; specifies that corporation & its not-for-profit subsidiaries shall conclusively act as instrumentalities of state for purposes of sovereign immunity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center & Research Institute [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0010 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Roll Call No. 0824 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-85
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -SJ 00761; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00761
2010-04-22 Withdrawn from Higher Education; Health Regulation; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00747; Substituted for CS/SB 1022 -SJ 00747; Read 2nd time -SJ 00747
2010-04-21 Received -SJ 00717
2010-04-20 In Messages; Referred to Higher Education; Health Regulation; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00717
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00777; Read 3rd time -HJ 00777; CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 00777
2010-04-07 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00628
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00628
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/07/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-22 Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00359
2010-03-18 Favorable by Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00359
2010-03-16 On Council agenda-- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development, 03/18/10, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-09 Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00235; Now in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00235
2010-03-05 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/09/10, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00035; On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, Reed Hall; CS by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00170; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00158; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Original reference(s) removed: State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); CS referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Education Policy Council -HJ 00163; Now in Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP) -HJ 00163
2010-02-26 Original reference(s) removed: State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); CS referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Education Policy Council; Now in Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
2010-02-19 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-02-17 CS by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2009-12-10 Referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council
2009-11-12 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1022 (Similar To) 2010-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00747; Substituted CS/HB 341 -SJ 00747; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2010-85) -SJ 00747

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100443Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback