FL H0341 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain requirements for operating personal watercraft & requirements relating to boating safety course required for leasing or renting personal watercraft from livery.
Title
Vessel Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 35 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 35 | |
2011-10-11 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/341 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0341/BillText/Filed/HTML |