FL H0341 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits smoking tobacco product in motor vehicle in which another person who is minor is present; provides penalties; provides for secondary enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Tobacco Products in Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2013-12-16HouseReferred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
2013-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0594 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3166136Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback