FL H0341 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 172 (Ch. 2015-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions addressing firefighter pension trust funds; revises provisions for distribution of insurance premium tax revenues under certain retirement plans; defines & revises terms; revises calculation of retirement income for firefighters & police officers; revises provisions addressing police officer retirement trust funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Pension Reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 172 (Ch. 2015-39)
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted CS/SB 172
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-09HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-08HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-08HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-03-13HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-03-13HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee
2015-03-13HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-12HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-11HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4
2015-03-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-01-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0172 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-39
H1279 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 172 (Ch. 2015-39)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
175021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18535Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback