FL H0341 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 576 (Ch. 2016-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises maximum number of beds for which student dormitory may be constructed by certain Florida College System institutions; prohibits use of state funds & tuition & fee revenues for certain expenses for such dormitories; prohibits dormitories constructed after certain date from being financed through issuance of bond.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Educational Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-17HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 576 (Ch. 2016-32)
2016-02-17HouseSubstituted SB 576
2016-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/16
2016-01-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-27HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2016-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2016-01-21HouseNow in Education Committee
2016-01-20HouseCS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-01-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-01-19HouseCS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2016-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-10-30HouseReferred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-10-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0576 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-32

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101340Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback