FL H0353 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1218
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1218
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCFS to perform drug test on applicant for Temporary Assistance for Needy Families benefits; requires such individual to bear cost of drug test; requires department to provide, & applicant to acknowledge receipt of, notice of drug-screening policy; requires department to increase amount of initial TANF benefit by amount paid by individual for drug testing; provides procedures for testing & retesting; requires department to provide information concerning local substance abuse treatment programs to individual who tests positive, etc.
Title
Drug Screening/Beneficiaries of TANF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#296 (Y: 78 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#295 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#294 (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#295 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#294 (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1218 | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time -SJ 854 | |
2011-05-04 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 831 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 579 | |
2011-04-26 | In Messages | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time -HJ 789 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/11 | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 658 | |
2011-04-14 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-13 | CS/CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 659 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/13/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-05 | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-04-04 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-31 | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 5 -HJ 409 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 338 | |
2011-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-23 | CS/CS by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 6 -HJ 340 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-14 | Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee | |
2011-03-11 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-09 | CS by HHS Access Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 -HJ 216 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 35 | |
2011-03-07 | On Committee agenda-- HHS Access Subcommittee, 03/09/11, 8:30 am, 12 HOB | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to HHS Access Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 35 | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0556 () 2011-05-04 - Read 2nd time -SJ 830