FL H0353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criminal penalties for specified employees who inflict cruel or inhuman treatment upon juvenile offenders; provides enhanced penalties for such treatment that results in great bodily harm, permanent disability, or permanent disfigurement; specifies that such conduct constitutes sufficient cause for employee's dismissal & prohibits such employee from future employment with juvenile justice system; provides incident reporting requirements; prohibits employee who witnesses such an incident from knowingly or willfully failing to report; prohibits false reporting, preventing another from reporting, or coercing another to alter testimony or reports; defines "juvenile offender" for purposes of prohibiting sexual misconduct with juvenile offenders.
Title
Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#100 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (280685, 392831) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/13 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/20/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-13 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-02-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/12/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0672 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S0678 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H4019 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S0678 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H4019 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
827 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |