FL H0353 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain agencies to provide report to Legislature relating to use of specified transferred funds; requires repayment of funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Trust Funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1504 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4200005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209079Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback