FL H0373 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
Pending: House Health Market Reform Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain health insurance policies & health maintenance contracts from requiring that insured & subscriber undergo step-therapy protocol & step-therapy override determination; prohibits such policies & contracts from excluding coverage for certain drugs; requires certain health coverage plans to provide process for requests for step-therapy protocol override determination; requires health coverage plans to grant requests to override step-therapy protocols under certain circumstances; prohibits health insurers & HMOs from retroactively denying certain claims because of insured & subscriber ineligibility; prohibits health insurers & HMOs from imposing additional prior authorization requirements for specified procedures & items.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
S672 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
S820 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6274239Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback