FL H0375 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicant for building permit to submit certain information to local building official; requires radio communications between certain crane operators; requires certain preparations for hurricane or high-wind event; requires preparedness plan for certain cranes; requires that hoisting equipment be secured in specified manner under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Regulation/Hoisting Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00037; On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 02/03/10, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall; Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00168; Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00168 | |
2010-02-04 | Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-02-03 | Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 02/03/10, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council | |
2009-11-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1174 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means