FL H0375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that absence of countersignature does not affect validity of policy or contract; authorizes offer of nonforfeiture benefit in form of return of premium.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#865 (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#502 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#502 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in returning Messages |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In returning messages |
2014-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 92 NAYS 22 |
2014-05-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended |
2014-05-01 | House | Was taken up |
2014-05-01 | House | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (035385, 260943, 276887, 309029, 590123, 647109, 974455) 952 |
2014-04-25 | House | In returning messages |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2014-04-25 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (481462) |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (153228) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 870 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-17 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-17 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-12 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/12/14, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-06 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-12-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0870 (Similar To) 2014-04-24 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
624 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 94072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |