FL H0383 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for issuance, renewal, denial, & revocation of licenses to establish advanced birth centers by AHCA; provides penalty for operating without license; provides applicability of licensure requirements under part II of ch. 408, F.S., to advanced birth centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Birth Centers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S448 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1026 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H1147 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3833081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3833105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3833131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383324Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465019Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback