FL H0383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Historically Black Colleges & Universities Matching Endowment Scholarship Program; provides requirements for program, HBCUs, & DOE.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities Matching Endowment Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | Favorable by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-10-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S876 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/383 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/383/BillText/Filed/PDF |