FL H0395 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides requirements relating to organization & responsibilities of DOT; rail enterprise & high-speed rail system; transportation funding; insurance & liability; motor vehicle & vessel operation; airport zoning regulations & contractors; utilities within rights-of-way; emergency response staging areas; M.P.O. projects; economic development transportation projects; & Jacksonville Transportation Authority leases; requires reports to Governor & Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#632 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (062889, 226511, 327873, 340243, 492309, 523409, 597379) 911
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2020-03-01HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-02-25HousePCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-13HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-12HouseCS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-10HouseCS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-02-02HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-30HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-30HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-28HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1172 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H771 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1039 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-87
H1219 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H1329 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S378 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S826 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1230 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1352 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1039
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 921
H921 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
S7018 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
S7054 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H203 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 410 passed
H519 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H533 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
H1315 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H1441 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H7099 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
S158 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1378 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1380 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1766 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1786 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S7020 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H571 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1086 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
311101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32759Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32873Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3418201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3418203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341836Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341838Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341840Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34358Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348754Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627748Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback