FL H0407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits agency that receives request to inspect or copy record from responding to such request by filing civil action against individual or entity making request.
Title
Public Records
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] | Sen. Erin Grall [R] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#82 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 4 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S602 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary