FL H0409 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain health care practitioners from specified licensing requirements when providing certain services to veterans in this state.
Title
Health Care Licensing Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-13 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-10-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S780 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/409 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/409/BillText/Filed/PDF |