FL H0425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides specified cost-of-living adjustment factor for members of Special Risk Class of Florida Retirement System.
Title
Cost-Of-Living Adjustment
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Rep. Matt Willhite [D] | Sen. Loranne Ausley [D] | Rep. Chuck Brannan [R] |
Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Wengay Newton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S858 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/425 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/425/BillText/Filed/PDF |