FL H0427 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for reclassification of burglaries committed under certain circumstances; adding a burglary that is reclassified under certain provisions to the factors a court must consider in determining whether to release a defendant on bail, etc.
Title
Traveling Across County Lines to Commit a Burglary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#860 (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#535 (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#535 (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-201 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-01 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2014-05-01 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 74 NAYS 37 |
2014-05-01 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (751182) |
2014-04-29 | House | In returning messages |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 15 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (751182) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 550 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 81 NAYS 36 |
2014-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/14 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-20 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/20/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-11 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/14, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-01-16 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0550 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 427 (Ch. 2014-201)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |