FL H0429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes dealers, subject to certain conditions, to advertise or hold out to public that they will pay sales tax on behalf of purchaser.
Title
Tax Absorption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-20 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | CS referred to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-19 | House | CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/19/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S508 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |