FL H0431 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for certification of victims of Florida reform school abuse; requires application to DOS; provides application requirements; provides for examination, correction, reviewing, & processing of application within certain timeframes; requires DOS to certify applicant as victim of Florida reform school abuse if application meets requirements; requires DOS to submit list of certified victims to Legislature; provides for claims for crime victim compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of Reform School Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-30HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-10-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S750 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4583175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback