FL H0435 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DHSMV or authorized tax collectors to collect e-mail addresses or telephone numbers & use e-mail or text messages in lieu of USPS for certain purposes; requires all e-mail addresses & telephone numbers be mutually shared between DHSMV & tax collectors upon request; limits applications DHSMV may accept by electronic or telephonic means; requires certain records made or kept by DHSMV be subject to inspection & copying; authorizes DHSMV, instead of FWCC, to accept certain applications by electronic or telephonic means.
Title
Electronic Notification by Tax Collectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-10 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S636 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1007 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
H1007 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |