FL H0437 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes use of licensed nurse registries for placement of attendant care provided for workers' compensation purposes.
Title
Nurse Registries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#462 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#462 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-101 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 880 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-12-16 | House | Now in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2019-12-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-12-11 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-10-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S880 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 437