FL H0445 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 662 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 662 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises student enrollment preferences relating to certain military transfers; & revises calculation of school grades by specified date to include students who earned specified score on Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery (ASVAB).
Title
Military Service Educational Opportunities
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Tyler Sirois [R] | Rep. Tommy Gregory [R] |
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Toby Overdorf [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 662 passed |
2020-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-10-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S662 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-75
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |