FL H0447 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties to provide notice to certain persons under certain circumstances; authorizing counties that issue building permits to charge a person a single search fee for a certain amount under certain circumstances; providing exemptions to certain contracting requirements; authorizing a local enforcement agency to close a permit under certain circumstances; authorizing the Florida Building Commission to approve updates to the Florida Building Code without certain findings under certain circumstances; prohibiting a local government from carrying forward more than a specified amount of unexpended revenue, etc.
Title
Construction
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | Rep. Ben Diamond [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] |
Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#373 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#231 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#231 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-75 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-03 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (970072) 1267 |
2019-05-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on Senate message list |
2019-05-03 | House | In returning messages |
2019-05-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (353614) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (970072) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 902 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (758399, 797809) |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-10 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/10/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall -- Temporarily postponed |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-21 | House | Now in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S902 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H715 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H1333 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
S1036 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
S1800 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H715 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H1333 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
S1036 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
S1800 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
558 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |